MD HB406 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that the application fee for a structural shoreline stabilization project located on or adjacent to a State-owned lake may not exceed $250; and requiring the Department of the Environment, in conjunction with the Department of Natural Resources, to identify up to three types of structural stabilization practices that may be implemented on or adjacent to a State-owned lake.
Title
Wetlands and Waterways Program - State-Owned Lakes - Structural Shoreline Stabilization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-7) (Y: 132 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-7) (Y: 132 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-7) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {260614/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Aquaculture
Boundaries
Construction
Data
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fees
Forms
Natural Resources, Department of
Records
Reports
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Shore Erosion
Wetlands
Boundaries
Construction
Data
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fees
Forms
Natural Resources, Department of
Records
Reports
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Shore Erosion
Wetlands