MD HB405 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB184

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court to award reasonable attorney's fees and related costs to the parent of a child with a disability who is the prevailing party in a certain special education proceeding; prohibiting a court from awarding attorney's fees and related costs to certain parents in a certain proceeding under certain circumstances; and authorizing an award of attorney's fees and related costs to a parent of a child with a disability who is a prevailing party under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Education - Judicial Actions - Attorney's Fees and Related Costs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
2020-11-01HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB184 (Carry Over) 2020-01-16 - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education8413(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback