MD HB405 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State House Trust to ensure that the Thurgood Marshall Memorial statues on Lawyer's Mall are maintained in the same material condition in which they were on July 1, 2018; providing that the Thurgood Marshall Memorial statues on Lawyer's Mall may be removed as necessary only under certain conditions; making the Act contingent on the completion of construction on Lawyer's Mall begun in August 2018 by the Department of General Services; and prohibiting the removal of the statutes except under certain conditions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State House Trust - Lawyer's Mall - Thurgood Marshall Memorial Statues

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-10SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-09SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-06HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2020-03-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {166787/1 Adopted
2020-03-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-01-28HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-23HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government9502(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9505(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback