MD HB405 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the amount of the appropriation, beginning in fiscal year 2021, that the Governor is required to include in the annual budget bill for the State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund from $1,000,000 to $3,000,000; and repealing the termination date for certain provisions of law relating to the Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Mandatory Funding and Repeal of Termination Date

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback