MD HB404 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB94
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing local authorities statewide to decrease the maximum speed limit to not less than a certain speed after performing an engineering and traffic investigation, subject to certain restrictions on the use of speed monitoring systems.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Limits - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (109-30) |
2022-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {113720/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB404 (Carry Over) 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Boundaries
Highways
Investigations and Inquiries
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Operation
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Highways
Investigations and Inquiries
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Operation
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |