MD HB404 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1180

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-20 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the placement and use of speed monitoring systems within a one-half mile radius of a child care center with a posted speed limit of 20 miles per hour or more under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Child Care Centers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-20HouseWithdrawn by Sponsor
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2020-10-22HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB1180 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation21809(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback