MD HB404 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a cemetery owned by the State and located on the grounds of a State facility be provided perpetual care; requiring specified activities or projects to be undertaken in consultation with the Maryland Historical Trust in accordance with specified provisions of law; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, beginning January 1, 2015, and annually thereafter, to report on the implementation of specified provisions to specified legislative committees; etc.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - State Facilities - Cemeteries
Sponsors
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] | Del. Aisha Braveboy [D] | Del. Michael Busch [D] | Del. Kirill Reznik [D] |
Del. Steven Schuh [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2014-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {587772/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {236588/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cemeteries
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Highways
Public Buildings and Facilities
Reports
State Hospitals
Cemeteries
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Highways
Public Buildings and Facilities
Reports
State Hospitals