MD HB403 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Attorney General, in consultation with certain stakeholders, to develop guidelines to assist public schools, hospitals, and courthouses to draft policies that limit civil immigration enforcement activities on their premises in order to ensure these facilities remain safe and accessible to all; and authorizing public schools, hospitals, and courthouses to establish and publish policies that limit immigration enforcement on their premises to the fullest extent possible; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immigration Enforcement - Public Schools, Hospitals, and Courthouses - Policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Floor Amendment 713527/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (Y: 44 N: 88 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - House - Floor Amendment 193429/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (Y: 49 N: 83 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - House - Floor Amendment 663522/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 89 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (93-45)
2020-03-09HouseSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-09HouseFloor Amendment {713527/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (44-88)
2020-03-09HouseFloor Amendment {193429/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (49-83)
2020-03-09HouseFloor Amendment {663522/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (43-89)
2020-03-06HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Moon) Adopted
2020-03-06HouseFavorable Adopted
2020-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-01-22HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-22HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB903 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government6111(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback