MD HB403 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "qualified farms", for purposes of a certain credit against the State income tax for certain food donations, to include farm businesses located in the State rather than in certain counties; extending the taxable years for which a qualified farm may claim the credit to 2021; reducing the maximum amount of tax certificates to be issued in a fiscal year, from $250,000 to $100,000; providing that a tax credit certificate may not be issued by the Department of Agriculture after December 31, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program - Expansion and Extension

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 361
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateSenators McCray, Peters, and Edwards
2019-04-05SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-05SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2019-04-05HouseDelegates Walker, Reilly, and Mosby
2019-04-05HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-05HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2019-04-05HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {949933/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {355963/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-30HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0403&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0403f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0403t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0403e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_361_hb0403e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0403_35596301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0403_94993301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0403_56362901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0403_31362201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb0403.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0403_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0483.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0403_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1121.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0403_31362201.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1552.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1402.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback