MD HB403 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting, under specified circumstances, a health care practitioner who has a specified compensation arrangement with a health care entity from a provision of law that prohibits a health care practitioner from referring a patient or directing specified persons to refer a patient to a specified health care entity; providing that the exemption is null and void if the Maryland Insurance Commissioner issues a specified order; etc.
Title
Maryland Patient Referral Law - Compensation Arrangements Under Federally Approved Programs and Models
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225 |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {976189/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Exemptions
Federal Government
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Hearings
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Notices
Patients
Salaries and Compensation
Disclosure
Exemptions
Federal Government
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Hearings
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Notices
Patients
Salaries and Compensation