MD HB400 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State, a county, or a bicounty agency to provide to a municipality certain notification at least 24 hours before the State, county, or bicounty agency sprays a pesticide to control mosquitos within the municipality; and providing a certain exception that if the State, county, or bicounty agency determines there is a certain public health threat which necessitates spraying, notification may be made as soon as practicable.
Title
Agriculture - Mosquito Control - Notification to Municipalities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296 |
2018-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {970411/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Diseases
Environmental Matters
Health
Insects
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Pest Control
Time
Agriculture
Diseases
Environmental Matters
Health
Insects
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Pest Control
Time