MD HB400 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "foster care recipient" for the purpose of a specified tuition waiver; altering a specified requirement that specified foster care recipients and specified unaccompanied homeless youth apply for specified financial aid by a specified time; and requiring specified public institutions of higher education and the Maryland Higher Education Commission to make specified annual reports to the General Assembly on or before September 1 of each year.
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263 |
2016-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (President) Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2016-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-28 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Foster Care
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Indigent Persons
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Youth
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Indigent Persons
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Youth