MD HB40 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to submit a report on or before December 1 each year to the Joint Committee on Pensions and the General Assembly on the funding ratio of the State Retirement and Pension System based on the market value of the assets.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Funding Ratio Report - Market Value of Assets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2016-11-14 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Reports
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Committees and Commissions
Reports
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement