MD HB40 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from the St. Mary's County property tax specified personal property purchased by businesses for personal property tax returns filed during the period from January 1, 2017, to December 31, 2018; exempting specified personal property from the St. Mary's County property tax for personal property tax returns filed on or after January 1, 2019; providing that specified personal property remains subject to the St. Mary's County property tax; etc.
Title
St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsors
Del. Matt Morgan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-09-22 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Cable Television
Equipment
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Personal Property
Property Tax
Railroads
Reports
St. Mary's County
Taxes - Property - Local
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utilities
Equipment
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Personal Property
Property Tax
Railroads
Reports
St. Mary's County
Taxes - Property - Local
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utilities