MD HB40 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the contents of the certificate of a qualified expert to include a statement from a qualified expert that the licensed professional failed to meet an applicable standard of professional care and supervision; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-3) (Y: 126 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-3) |
2015-02-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-02-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-02-23 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-10 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 2:00 p.m. |
2015-01-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Architects
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
District Courts
Engineers
Evidence
Interior Designers
Landscape Architects
Licenses
Negligence
Surveyors
Work, Labor and Employment
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
District Courts
Engineers
Evidence
Interior Designers
Landscape Architects
Licenses
Negligence
Surveyors
Work, Labor and Employment