MD HB40 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Third Reading Failed (23-23)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Third Reading Failed (23-23)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a vendor of single family residential real property to display or make available specified utility information under specified circumstances in a specified manner; providing that specified information is provided without warranties; providing that the failure of a vendor to provide specified information to the purchaser does not give the purchaser the right to rescind a contract; etc.
Title
Residential Property Sales - Disclosure of Utility Consumption
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Failed (23-23) (Y: 23 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Failed (23-23) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {270619/1 Report Adopted |
2013-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2012-10-26 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Disclosure
Energy Matters
Housing
Prices
Real Estate
Real Property
Utilities
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Disclosure
Energy Matters
Housing
Prices
Real Estate
Real Property
Utilities