MD HB40 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the membership of the Joint Committee on Workers' Compensation Benefit and Insurance Oversight to include a representative from a self-insured local government entity.
Title
Joint Committee on Workers' Compensation Benefit and Insurance Oversight -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (45-1) | |
2011-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (127-7) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-01-19 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-17 | First Reading Economic Matters |