MD HB4 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Hearing: Mar 20 @ 12:00 pm Senate Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from placing or inscribing an item or a symbol, including an actual or depicted noose or swastika, whether temporary or permanent, on any real or personal property, public or private, without the express permission of the owner, owner's agent, or lawful occupant of the property, with the intent to threaten or intimidate any person or group of persons; and establishing that a penalty of imprisonment not exceeding 3 years or a fine not exceeding $5,000 or both applies to a violation of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes – Hate Crimes – Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (136-2)
2019-02-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {842312/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-07HouseHearing 1/15 at 3:00 p.m.
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2018-11-08HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback