MD HB4 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the State from purchasing infant formula in containers and prohibiting the manufacture, sale, or distribution of containers containing a specified amount of bisphenol-A on or after July 1, 2014; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt regulations on or before January 1, 2012; authorizing the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to suspend implementation of provisions of the Act under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Public Health - Containers of Infant Formula Manufactured with Bisphenol-A -
Sponsors
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. James Hubbard [D] | Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] | Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] |
Del. Dan Morhaim [D] | Del. Peter Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-28 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-28 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/8 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-12 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-09-23 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Beverage Containers
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Equipment
Food
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Minors
Procurement
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Equipment
Food
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Minors
Procurement
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation