MD HB399 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an individual to request aid in dying by making certain requests; prohibiting another individual from requesting aid in dying on behalf of an individual; requiring a certain request to be made in a certain manner; requiring a written request for aid in dying to meet certain requirements; establishing certain requirements for witnesses to a written request for aid in dying; requiring a written request for aid in dying to be in a certain form; etc.
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (74-66) (Y: 75 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (74-66) |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-04 | House | Special Order until 03/06 (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {816189/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary |
Subjects
Advance Medical Directives
Beneficiaries
Contracts
Data
Death
Drugs
Evidence
Forms
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Insurance
Liability
Mental and Behavioral Health
Murder
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Vital Records
Witnesses
Beneficiaries
Contracts
Data
Death
Drugs
Evidence
Forms
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Insurance
Liability
Mental and Behavioral Health
Murder
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Vital Records
Witnesses