MD HB398 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to give preference to applications for certain loans that will use the services of certain small, minority, women-owned, and veteran-owned businesses, particularly those businesses that provide employment for individuals trained through workforce development programs, for loans for certain net-zero homes under the Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 120 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-12SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-12SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (120-16)
2020-03-09HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-28HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-22HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Housing and Community Development42001(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development42002(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development42003(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development42004(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment11708.1(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government920B-05(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback