MD HB70 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB398
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to give preference to applications for funding for a net-zero home from the Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Fund that will use the services of small, minority, women-owned, and veteran-owned businesses in the clean energy industry, particularly those businesses that provide employment for individuals trained through workforce development programs supported by the Strategic Energy Investment Fund and the Clean Energy Workforce Account.
Title
Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
Sponsors
Del. Mike Rogers [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-2) |
2021-02-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-04 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB77 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
HB398 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
HB398 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Construction
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
Energy
Energy Matters
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Loans
Minorities
Renewable Energy Sources
Veterans
Women
Construction
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
Energy
Energy Matters
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Loans
Minorities
Renewable Energy Sources
Veterans
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 708.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 20B-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |