MD HB397 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusting the voting thresholds necessary for the Montgomery County Council or the Montgomery County District Council to take certain actions related to the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission.
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - County Council and District Council - Voting Thresholds PG/MC 100-22
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611 |
2022-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Bi-County Agencies
Budgets
County Councils
Local Government - Generally
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Montgomery County
Salaries and Compensation
Voting
Zoning and Planning
Budgets
County Councils
Local Government - Generally
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Montgomery County
Salaries and Compensation
Voting
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Land Use | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 15 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 15 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 18 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 18 | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 22 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 23 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |