MD HB397 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 636
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 636
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Public Service Commission, by January 1, 2023, to establish an administrative process to approve supply offers for electricity or gas for households in the State that receive energy assistance through a program in the Office of Home Energy Programs; prohibiting, beginning on July 1, 2023, unless the Commission has approved the supply offer, a third-party retail supplier from offering to provide electricity or gas, renewing a certain contract, or charging a certain fee to certain households in the State; etc.
Title
Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Supply Offers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 38 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 38 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 636 |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-11) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-38) |
2021-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {933296/1 Adopted |
2021-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-09-23 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB31 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 637
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Energy
Energy Matters
Fees
internet
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Contracts
Energy
Energy Matters
Fees
internet
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 4 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |