MD HB397 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-29)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Favorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Emergency Number Systems Board to establish certain minimum standards for records retention guidelines for 9-1-1 audio, video, text messages, and data; requiring the Board to establish minimum standards for certain 9-1-1 systems that ensure access for individuals with disabilities; altering the purposes of the 9-1-1 Trust Fund beginning on January 1, 2020; authorizing the use of money collected from a certain 9-1-1 fee to pay costs associated with maintenance, operations, and programs approved by the Board; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)

Sponsors

Del. Susan Krebs [R]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Carl Anderton [R]
Del. Steven Arentz [R]Del. Lauren Arikan [R]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]
Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Sandy Bartlett [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]
Del. Wendell Beitzel [R]Del. Regina Boyce [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Jason Buckel [R]
Del. Ned Carey [D]Del. Andrew Cassilly [R]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D]
Del. Nick Charles [D]Del. Brian Chisholm [R]Del. Jerry Clark [R]Del. Paul Corderman [R]
Del. Dan Cox [R]Del. Brian Crosby [D]Del. Debra Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]
Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. Jeff Ghrist [R]Del. James Gilchrist [D]
Del. Andrea Harrison [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]
Del. Kevin Hornberger [R]Del. Seth Howard [R]Del. Julian Ivey [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]
Del. Ken Kerr [D]Del. Trent Kittleman [R]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]
Del. Mary Lehman [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Bob Long [R]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]
Del. Michael Malone [R]Del. Johnny Mautz [R]Del. Susan McComas [R]Del. Mike Mckay [R]
Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D]Del. Neil Parrott [R]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]
Del. Lily Qi [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Teresa Reilly [R]Del. April Rose [R]
Del. Sid Saab [R]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Haven Shoemaker [R]Del. Stephanie Smith [D]
Del. Jared Solomon [D]Del. Kathy Szeliga [R]Del. Veronica Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]
Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Ron Watson [D]Del. Melissa Wells [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]
Del. Pat Young [D]Del. Christopher Adams [R]Del. Heather Bagnall [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Steve Johnson [D]Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]
Del. Ric Metzgar [R]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]
Del. Karen Young [D]

Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {536182/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-30HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback