MD HB397 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center, in consultation with the Administrative Office of the Courts, to develop a procedure and methodology for the compilation and analysis of specified data and the preparation of a specified report and recommendations; and requiring the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center to compile and analyze specified data and to submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015.
Title
Commercial Bail Data Analysis
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Marice Morales [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bail
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Pretrial Detention or Release
Records
Reports
Sunset
Bail
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Pretrial Detention or Release
Records
Reports
Sunset