MD HB397 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a petitioner to file a written request to shield court records relating to a peace order or protective order proceeding; authorizing the court to order the shielding of all court records relating to a peace order or protective order proceeding if the respondent consented to the entry of the peace order or protective order; requiring the court to balance specified considerations in determining whether to shield court records relating to a peace order or protective order proceeding; etc.
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Consent Orders - Shielding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-34) (Y: 102 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (106-29) (Y: 106 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (106-29) (Y: 106 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-34) |
2014-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {558078/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-29) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {362517/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-23 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Family Law
Hearings
Notices
Petitions
Privacy
Protection Orders
Records
Rules and Regulations
Statutes of Limitation
Victims
Courts
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Family Law
Hearings
Notices
Petitions
Privacy
Protection Orders
Records
Rules and Regulations
Statutes of Limitation
Victims