MD HB396 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the date of the statewide primary election in the year in which the President of the United States is elected; altering the date of the primary election for municipal offices in Baltimore City in the year in which the President of the United States is elected; altering the deadline from 6 to 9 days after the filing dates for filing a petition to challenge a candidate's residency; clarifying specified provisions of law concerning the filing of specified vacancies in nomination; etc.
Title
Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2015-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {994532/2 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2015-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {855667/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Ballots
Baltimore City
Campaign Financing
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Federal Government
Judicial Review
Petitions
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Secretary of State
Baltimore City
Campaign Financing
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Federal Government
Judicial Review
Petitions
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Secretary of State