MD HB394 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the period of time that certain individuals who are at least a certain age and who hold a learner's instructional permit are required to wait before taking certain examinations for a provisional driver's license.
Title
Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum Duration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2018-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Driver Education
Drivers' Licenses
Examinations
Motor Vehicle Operation
Parole and Probation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Youth
Drivers' Licenses
Examinations
Motor Vehicle Operation
Parole and Probation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Youth