MD HB390 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State's Attorney for Dorchester County to appoint criminal investigators, subject to the approval of the Dorchester County Council; authorizing the State's Attorney for Dorchester County to designate a chief investigator and assign other ranks and titles to other criminal investigators; providing that a criminal investigator who is appointed under the Act shall serve at the pleasure of the State's Attorney for Dorchester County; etc.
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-23 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Arrests
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Criminal Law - Procedure
Dorchester County
Guns
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Oaths
Public Employees
State's Attorneys
Subpoenas
Summonses
Weapons
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Criminal Law - Procedure
Dorchester County
Guns
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Oaths
Public Employees
State's Attorneys
Subpoenas
Summonses
Weapons