MD HB39 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours certification within the State Department of Education beginning in the 2017-2018 school year; providing that the purpose of the Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours certification is to recognize local school systems with start times that are consistent with the school start times recommended by the Department and specified organizations; requiring the Department to grant certification to a local school system that qualifies by meeting specified requirements; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 247
2016-04-11HousePassed Enrolled
2016-04-11HouseThird Reading Passed (138-1)
2016-04-11HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (43-3)
2016-04-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {464139/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-21SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-21HouseThird Reading Passed (134-1)
2016-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {995161/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2016-01-28HouseHearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
2016-01-18HouseHearing cancelled
2016-01-20HouseHearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
2016-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2015-10-08HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0039&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0039f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0039t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0039e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_247_hb0039e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0039_99516101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0039_46413901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0039.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0039_w&m.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0039_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0039,h-0652&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0039,s-1296&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0039,h-1417&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback