MD HB389 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified distributors, on or before January 1, 2014, to establish or participate in a program, approved by the Department of the Environment, for the collection and recycling of specified beverage containers; requiring specified owners and managers of bars and restaurants, beginning January 1, 2014, to separate, store, and arrange for the collection and recycling of specified beverage containers; etc.
Title
Recycling - Bars and Restaurants - Beverage Containers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2011-02-07 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-03 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Counties
Environment, Department of
Recycling
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Counties
Environment, Department of
Recycling
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB0389.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb0389f.pdf |