MD HB387 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a custodian that receives a request from a person wishing to inspect a public record from filing suit under the Public Information Act against the requesting person.
Title
Public Information Act - Suits Filed by Custodians - Prohibition
Sponsors
Del. Aruna Miller [D] | Del. Bilal Ali [D] | Del. Angela Angel [D] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] |
Del. Carolyn Howard [D] | Del. Jay Jalisi [D] | Del. Marc Korman [D] | Sen. Clarence Lam [D] |
Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Pat Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2018-02-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |