MD HB382 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the salaries of the Sheriff of Somerset County, the State's Attorney for Somerset County, the County Commissioners of Somerset County, the President of the County Commissioners of Somerset County, members of the County Roads Board of Somerset County, and the President of the County Roads Board of Somerset County and the salaries and daily allowance for certain expenses of the Chief Judge of the Orphans' Court for Somerset County and associate judges of the Orphans' Court for Somerset County.
Title
Somerset County – Local Officials – Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-2) |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB439 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 614
Subjects
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Judges
Orphans' Court
Public Officials
Reimbursement Rates
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Somerset County
State's Attorneys
Transportation
County Commissioners
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Judges
Orphans' Court
Public Officials
Reimbursement Rates
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Somerset County
State's Attorneys
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 2 | 333 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 15 | 420 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 2 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Somerset County | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Somerset County | 9 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |