MD HB382 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1245
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a child, an individual under the age of 18 years, from knowingly sending, displaying, or publishing to another a sexually explicit or nude image depicting another child under certain circumstances; prohibiting a child from knowingly sending, displaying, or publishing to another a sexually explicit or nude image depicting only himself or herself under certain circumstances; prohibiting a child from knowingly possessing a sexually explicit or nude image depicting another child without the other child's consent; etc.
Title
Juvenile Law - Conduct by Children Involving Sexually Explicit or Nude Images
Sponsors
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-10-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1245 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Education
Education, State Board of
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Minors
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Petitions
Pornography
Public Schools
Education, State Board of
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Minors
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Petitions
Pornography
Public Schools
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3-8D | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3-8D | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3-8D | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3-8D | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3-8D | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 11 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 11 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 11 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 205.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0382?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0382f.pdf |