MD HB382 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing as redundant specified provisions relating to members of the Judges' Retirement System designating multiple beneficiaries under a specified optional retirement allowance in the State Retirement and Pension System; clarifying that specified members of the State Retirement and Pension System may designate multiple beneficiaries under specified optional retirement allowances.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Optional Retirement Allowances - Designated Beneficiaries
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 9:00 a.m. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 8:30 a.m. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-25 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2016-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-28 | House | First Reading Appropriations |