MD HB381 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Public Service Commission to consider all areas of the State when determining the need for additional electricity generation; requiring an electric company to reference generation potential in all areas of the State in a request for proposals submitted to the Commission; specifying criteria that an electric company shall consider in a request for proposals; applying the Act prospectively; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Electric Companies - Generation Request for Proposals - Expansion of Area
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments 693795/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-01 | First Reading Economic Matters |