MD HB379 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement at a specified time if the person was convicted of possession of marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-40) (Y: 96 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2)
2017-04-10SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments {998471/1 Report Adopted
2017-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-20SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (96-40)
2017-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {122412/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2017-02-07HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0379&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0379f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0379t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0379_12241201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0379_99847101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0379.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0379_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0379_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0379,h-0786&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0379,s-1548&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback