MD HB379 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement to reduce specified amounts the Governor is required to include in the budget bill for payment to the State Retirement and Pension System by the amount of administrative and operational expenses for the Board of Trustees and the State Retirement Agency paid by specified local employers; and repealing the authorization for specified local employers to deduct specified amounts from specified required employer contributions.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Payments and Deductions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn |
2013-02-27 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Governor
Local Government Mandates
Retirement Systems
State Pensions and Retirement
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Governor
Local Government Mandates
Retirement Systems
State Pensions and Retirement