MD HB378 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 187
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 187
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "certifying provider" to include physician assistants that have an active, unrestricted license to practice, have an active delegation agreement with a primary supervising physician who is a certifying provider, and are in good standing with the State Board of Physicians; and altering the membership of the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission.
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Certifying Providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 187 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {726784/1 Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB304 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 188
Subjects
Cannabis
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Dentists
Health
Health Occupations
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Nurses
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Podiatrists
Public Health
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Dentists
Health
Health Occupations
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Nurses
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Podiatrists
Public Health
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 13 | 3301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |