MD HB374 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a provision of law to authorize, rather than require, a court to hold a hearing on a petition for expungement if the State's Attorney files a timely objection to the petition; authorizing a court to deny a petition for expungement without a hearing if the court finds that the petition is barred as a matter of law; authorizing a specified petitioner to request a hearing within 30 days under specified circumstances; requiring the court to hold a hearing under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing
Sponsors
Del. Carlos Sanchez [D] | Del. Marc Korman [D] | Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Pamela Queen [D] |
Del. James Tarlau [D] | Del. Joseph Vallario [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Judiciary |