MD HB372 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from the recordation tax and the State transfer tax the transfer of real property between a parent business entity and its wholly owned subsidiary or between subsidiaries wholly owned by the same parent business entity under specified circumstances; applying the Act to instruments of writing recorded on or after July 1, 2013; etc.
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-0) (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-0) (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453 |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-0) |
2013-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senators Peters, Robey, and DeGrange |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2013-04-04 | House | Delegates Frick, A. Miller, and Serafini |
2013-04-04 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-04 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2013-04-04 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {439438/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {465269/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Exemptions
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Real Property
Recordation
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Corporations and Associations
Exemptions
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Real Property
Recordation
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax