MD HB371 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: Feb 21 @ 1:00 pm House Ways and Means Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Phasing out, over 4 taxable years, a certain limitation on the amount of certain military retirement income that may be included in a certain subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Military Retirement Income (Defense Workforce Opportunity Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-22HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General10207(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback