MD HB371 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a provision that prohibits the Governor from appointing a member of the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland, a member of the Board of Directors of the Medical System Corporation, or an officer or a full-time employee of the Medical System Corporation or the University of Maryland, Baltimore Campus to the Emergency Medical Services Board; and prohibiting the Governor from appointing more than two persons from certain health entities under the same governing board to the Emergency Medical Services Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 203
2018-03-29HousePassed Enrolled
2018-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-29HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2018-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {637775/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-26SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-02-23HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2018-02-21HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-21HouseFavorable with Amendments {116686/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-08HouseHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-24HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0371&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0371f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0371t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0371e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_203_hb0371e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0371_11668601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0371_63777501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0371.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0371_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0146.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0371_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0875.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0946.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback