MD HB370 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the requirement that Washington Suburban Transit Commission members appointed by the Governor serve as the Commission's appointees to be principal members of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Board of Directors; encouraging each signatory of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact to support reform of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority's governance structure to improve the efficiency, accountability, and effectiveness of the Authority's functions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Metro Board Member Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 353
2018-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (42-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-04-03SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {580211/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-15HouseHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-24HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback