MD HB37 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from making certain telephone solicitations to a certain called party in a certain manner by restricting the methods, times, and identifying information that the person making the call may utilize; providing that the Act does not apply to certain entities and circumstances; and making a violation of the Act an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice that is subject to enforcement and penalties under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act.
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Telephone Solicitation (Stop the Spam Calls Act of 2023)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414 |
2023-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate Recede |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Motion to Withdraw Committee Amendments (Senator Griffith) Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Committee Amendments (Senator Griffith) Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Favorable Report as Amended (Senator Griffith) Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Griffith) Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2023-04-10 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2023-04-10 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2023-04-10 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {893826/1 Adopted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {363820/1 Adopted |
2023-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2023-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2022-11-04 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB90 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Data
Ethics
Fraud
Identification
Injury
Privacy
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
Solicitation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time
Unfair Trade Practices
Utility Regulation
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Data
Ethics
Fraud
Identification
Injury
Privacy
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
Solicitation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time
Unfair Trade Practices
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 8 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |