MD HB37 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Elections and each local board of elections to refer to absentee ballots as "mail-in" ballots and absentee voting as "mail-in voting" in all communications; requiring the State Board and each local board to include in public communications a statement that "mail-in voting" is referred to as absentee voting in the Maryland Constitution, the Annotated Code of Maryland and the Code of Maryland Regulations; making provision for absentee ballots to include prepaid return postage; etc.
Title
Election Law – Absentee Voting – References in Public Communications and Prepaid Postage for Return of Ballots
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kagan) Rejected (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kagan) Rejected (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 36 |
2020-03-18 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-33) |
2020-03-18 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kagan) (30-14) Rejected |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Floor Amendment {483120/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-37) |
2020-01-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-01-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {375867/1 Adopted |
2020-01-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-07 | House | Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-09-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB145 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 37
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Ballots
Communications
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Notices
Postal Service
Rules and Regulations
State Documents
Voting
Ballots
Communications
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Notices
Postal Service
Rules and Regulations
State Documents
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 9 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |