MD HB37 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a court to issue an order authorizing or directing a law enforcement officer to use a cell site simulator after making a certain determination; limiting to 30 days or less the time period during which a cell site simulator may be used or location information may be obtained under the authority of a certain order; requiring cell site simulator use by law enforcement to begin 10 days after issuance of an order; providing that evidence obtained in violation of the Act is subject to the exclusionary rule, as judicially determined; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {502617/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Communication
Evidence
Law Enforcement
Mobile Devices
Privacy
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Time
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Communication
Evidence
Law Enforcement
Mobile Devices
Privacy
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Time