MD HB37 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, and emergency medical services members for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Membership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-11-13 | House | Pre-filed |