MD HB367 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the name of the Maryland Mental Health Crisis Response System to be the Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response System; requiring the Crisis Response System to evaluate the outcomes of services through the annual collection of data on behavioral health calls received by police, attempted and completed suicides, unnecessary hospitalizations, hospital diversions, arrests and detentions and diversion of arrests and detentions of individuals with behavioral health diagnoses; etc.
Title
Public Health - Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-04-11 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {896587/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Arrests
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Death
Emergency Medical Services
Federal Government
Health Care Facilities
Hospitals
Mental Health
Names
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Records
Registration
Social Services
Telephones
Transportation
Appropriations
Arrests
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Death
Emergency Medical Services
Federal Government
Health Care Facilities
Hospitals
Mental Health
Names
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Records
Registration
Social Services
Telephones
Transportation